Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] |
17.06.1989 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] |
21.01.1988 | First examination report | |
01.08.1986 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.09.1986 [1986/38] |
29.05.1986 | Publication of search report | published on 16.07.1986 [1986/29] |
18.05.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.07.1985 [1985/29] |