EP0152608 - Control method for a compound refrigeration plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 06.03.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hansen, Herbert Mainstrasse 53 D-5000 Köln 50 / DE | 02 /
Hartmann, Herbert Mainstrasse 63 D-5000 Köln 50 / DE | 03 /
Haaf, Siegfried, Dipl.-Ing. Holzweg 4 D-5000 Köln 50 / DE | [1985/35] | Representative(s) | Schaefer, Gerhard Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | Schaefer, Gerhard, Dr. Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 84115860.3 | 19.12.1984 | [1985/35] | Priority number, date | DE19843405810 | 17.02.1984 Original published format: DE 3405810 | [1985/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0152608 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0152608 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0152608 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F25B49/00 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
F25B49/027 (EP);
F25B2400/075 (EP);
F25B2400/22 (EP);
F25B2700/21161 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Verbundkälteanlage | [1985/35] | English: | Control method for a compound refrigeration plant | [1985/35] | French: | Procédé de commande d'une installation frigorifique complexe | [1985/35] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/49] | 13.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.08.1989
31.08.1989
ADMISSIBLE Danfoss A/S 6430 Nordborg / DK Opponent's representative Knoblauch, Ulrich Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch, Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.08.1989
31.08.1989
ADMISSIBLE Danfoss A/S DK-6430 Nordborg / DK Opponent's representative Knoblauch, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing. Kühhornshofweg 10 D-60320 Frankfurt / DE | 10.10.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.04.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.09.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.09.1990 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.09.1990 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 07.10.1990 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1991/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.12.1988 | GB | 07.12.1988 | IT | 07.12.1988 | NL | 07.12.1988 | SE | 07.12.1988 | AT | 19.12.1988 | CH | 31.12.1988 | LI | 31.12.1988 | LU | 31.12.1988 | [2000/03] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 07.12.1988 | |
IT | 07.12.1988 | ||
NL | 07.12.1988 | ||
SE | 07.12.1988 | ||
AT | 19.12.1988 | ||
CH | 31.12.1988 | ||
LI | 31.12.1988 | ||
LU | 31.12.1988 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 07.12.1988 | |
IT | 07.12.1988 | ||
NL | 07.12.1988 | ||
SE | 07.12.1988 | ||
AT | 19.12.1988 | ||
CH | 31.12.1988 | ||
LI | 31.12.1988 | ||
Former [1990/42] | NL | 07.12.1988 | |
SE | 07.12.1988 | ||
AT | 19.12.1988 | ||
CH | 31.12.1988 | ||
LI | 31.12.1988 | ||
BE | 07.03.1989 | ||
Former [1990/05] | NL | 07.12.1988 | |
SE | 07.12.1988 | ||
CH | 31.12.1988 | ||
LI | 31.12.1988 | ||
BE | 07.03.1989 | ||
Former [1989/52] | NL | 07.12.1988 | |
SE | 07.12.1988 | ||
BE | 07.03.1989 | ||
Former [1989/46] | SE | 07.12.1988 | |
BE | 07.03.1989 | ||
Former [1989/24] | SE | 07.12.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3138941 (JENSEN ERIK H); | [A]US3390538 (MILLER CHARLES E); | [X]US3460354 (PETERSON HANS P); | [A]US3739596 (BALLARD J); | [X]US4134274 (JOHNSEN CLIFFORD N); | [Y]DE2748252 (SIEMENS AG); | [X]DE3025439 (TYLER REFRIGERATION CORP [US]); | [A]GB2067275 (TRENDPAM ENG LTD) |