EP0156027 - Polyetherimide blends [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1989 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1985/40] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giles, Harold Frazee Jr. Wilshire Drive Cheshire Massachusetts 01225 / US | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst, et al Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | Schüler, Horst, Dr., et al Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 84115905.6 | 20.12.1984 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | US19830566659 | 29.12.1983 Original published format: US 566659 | [1985/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0156027 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0156027 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08L79/08 | [1985/40] | CPC: |
C08L79/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L79/08, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L79/08, C08L9/06, C08L67/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/40] | Title | German: | Polyetherimid-Mischungen | [1985/40] | English: | Polyetherimide blends | [1985/40] | French: | Compositions de polyéthérimide | [1985/40] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/22] | 09.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4141927 (WHITE DWAIN M, et al) | Examination | - RÖMPPS CHEMIE-LEXIKON, 8. Auflage,1979, Franckh sche Verlagsbuchhandlung Stuttgart, S.119 |