EP0162966 - Electric stepper motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VDO Adolf Schindling AG Gräfstrasse 103 D-60487 Frankfurt / DE | [1985/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sudler, Roland Gr. Seestrasse 8 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main / DE | [1985/49] | Representative(s) | Klein, Thomas Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Sodener Strasse 9 D-65824 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE | Application number, filing date | 84116133.4 | 21.12.1984 | [1985/49] | Priority number, date | DE19843420034 | 29.05.1984 Original published format: DE 3420034 | [1985/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0162966 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0162966 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H02K37/14 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
H02K37/16 (EP);
G04C13/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1985/49] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Schrittmotor | [1985/49] | English: | Electric stepper motor | [1985/49] | French: | Moteur pas à pas électrique | [1985/49] | File destroyed: | 05.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 11.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/07] | 10.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AT247968B ; | [A]DE1463844 ; | [A]DE2707684 |