EP0149221 - Classifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.1990 [1990/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTHERN ENGINEERING INDUSTRIES PLC NEI House Regent Centre Newcastle upon Tyne NE3 3SB / GB | [1985/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Green, Colin Andrew 30, Thorpes Road Heanor Derbyshire / GB | 02 /
Welbourne, Michael Charles 25, Dean Close Littleover Derby DE3 7EF / GB | [1985/30] | Representative(s) | Sanderson, Michael John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | Sanderson, Michael John, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1988/50] | Armitage, Ian Michael MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1985/30] | Graham, John George Northern Engineering Industries plc Group Patents Department c/o International Research & Development Co. Ltd. Fossway Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE6 2YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 84116165.6 | 22.12.1984 | [1985/30] | Priority number, date | GB19840001009 | 14.01.1984 Original published format: GB 8401009 | [1985/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0149221 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0149221 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0149221 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B07B7/083 | [1985/30] | CPC: |
B07B7/083 (EP,US);
B07B11/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1985/30] | Title | German: | Sortierer | [1985/30] | English: | Classifier | [1985/30] | French: | Trieur | [1985/30] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 16.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB976876 ; | [YD]GB515717 (L ATOMIC SOC); | [A]GB524343 (NATHAN MUTCH); | [A]DE737374 (HERMANNUS VAN TONGEREN); | [Y]DE839153 (ALPINE AG EISENGIESSEREI, et al); | [Y]GB1034090 (MICROCYLOMAT CO); | [A]EP0067894 (OMYA GMBH [DE]); | [AP]GB2123715 (FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP) |