EP0157943 - Device for linking shopping trolleys and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.1989 [1989/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schramme, Karin Säntisblick 6 D-7778 Markdorf / DE | For all designated states Bohler, Theresia Glashütten 19/1 D-7799 Ilmensee / DE | [1985/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/42] | Representative(s) | Engelhardt, Guido Patentanwalt Postfach 13 50 88003 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | Engelhardt, Guido, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 13 50 D-88003 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 84116195.3 | 22.12.1984 | [1985/42] | Priority number, date | DE19843405101 | 14.02.1984 Original published format: DE 3405101 | [1985/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0157943 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0157943 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/06, B62B5/00 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
G07F7/0663 (EP,US);
B62B3/1404 (EP,US);
Y10S194/905 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/42] | Title | German: | Koppelvorrichtung für Einkaufswagen und dgl. | [1985/42] | English: | Device for linking shopping trolleys and the like | [1985/42] | French: | Dispositif de connexion pour chariots d'achat et similaires | [1985/42] | File destroyed: | 17.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 28.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/44] | 24.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/10] | 28.09.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3238091 [ ] (FUCHS PETER); | DE3127940 [ ] (FUCHS PETER [DE]); | DE3038294 [ ] (FUCHS PETER, et al) |