EP0185795 - Process for preparing a dairy product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prella, Giovanni Via Agordat 16 I-Vercelli / IT | [1986/27] | Application number, filing date | 84116296.9 | 24.12.1984 | [1986/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0185795 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0185795 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A23C19/076, A23C19/028 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
A23C19/0285 (EP,US);
A23C19/076 (EP,US);
A23C19/0765 (EP,US);
A23C2210/208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Molkereiproduktes | [1986/27] | English: | Process for preparing a dairy product | [1986/27] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un produit laitier | [1986/27] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 14.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.12.1985 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   31.01.1986 | 24.12.1985 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   31.01.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE964652 (MAX E SCHULZ DR); | [A]FR1241283 ; | [AD]FR2405655 (DORR OLIVER INC [US]); | [X]CH623204 (NESTLE SA [CH]) |