EP0151807 - Autochanger type disc player [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1990 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.1990 [1990/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimbo, Takao c/o Patent Division Toshiba Corporation Principal Office 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kurokawa, Hiroto c/o Patent Division Toshiba Corporation Principal Office 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/34] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84116404.9 | 27.12.1984 | [1985/34] | Priority number, date | JP19830244463 | 27.12.1983 Original published format: JP 24446383 | [1985/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0151807 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0151807 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0151807 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/22 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
G11B17/30 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/34] | Title | German: | Automatischer Plattenwechsler | [1985/34] | English: | Autochanger type disc player | [1985/34] | French: | Tourne-disque du genre à changeur automatique | [1985/34] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1989/50: Teilanmeldung 88120840.9 eingereicht am 27/12/84 | EPB 1989/50: Divisional application 88120840.9 filed on 27/12/84 | EPB 1989/50: Demande divisionnaire 88120840.9 déposée le 27/12/84 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/34] | 13.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP88120840.9 / EP0313110 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 13.12.1989 | [1990/43] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB590786 (ERIK ARNE LANDBERG, et al); | [A]GB2102184 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US2673739 (OLGIERD GIERWIATOWSKI) |