EP0149247 - Rolling Mill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takagi, Michimasa Shigakuryo, 11-1 Jonancho-4-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 02 /
Kajiwara, Toshiyuki 22-11, Kujicho-5-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 03 /
Sakanaka, Takao 17-1, Hanayamacho-2-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | [1985/30] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/30] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84116427.0 | 28.12.1984 | [1985/30] | Priority number, date | JP19830247684 | 29.12.1983 Original published format: JP 24768483 | [1985/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0149247 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0149247 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0149247 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B21B13/14 | [1985/30] | CPC: |
B21B13/145 (EP,US);
B21B13/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/30] | Title | German: | Walzwerk | [1985/30] | English: | Rolling Mill | [1985/30] | French: | Laminoir | [1985/30] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 08.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56091910 ; | [A]JP56059517 ; | [A]US2651954 (DAHLSTROM FRANK P); | [A]FR1232177 (SCHLOEMANN AG); | [A]GB2096035 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 166 (M-93)[838], 23rd October 1981; & JP-A-56 091 910 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA JUKOGYO K.K.) 25-07-1981, & JP56091910 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 119 (M-81)[791], 31st July 1981; & JP-A-56 059 517 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA JUKOGYO K.K.) 23-05-1981, & JP56059517 A 00000000 |