EP0149853 - Process for measuring activity of dehydrogenase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.1990 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.04.1990 [1990/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAKO PURE CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 10, Doshomachi-3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/31] | For all designated states WAKO PURE CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 10, Doshomachi-3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamanishi, Kazuhiko 17-10, Akatsuka-3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hanada, Toshiro 103, Minamihaitsu, 784, Oaza Minamiotsuka Kawagoe-shi / JP | [1985/31] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/31] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84116437.9 | 28.12.1984 | [1985/31] | Priority number, date | JP19830251883 | 28.12.1983 Original published format: JP 25188383 | [1985/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0149853 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0149853 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0149853 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/32 | [1985/31] | CPC: |
C12Q1/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Messung der Wirksamkeit von Dehydrogenase | [1985/31] | English: | Process for measuring activity of dehydrogenase | [1985/31] | French: | Procédé pour la mesure de l'activité de déshydrogénase | [1985/31] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 15.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2000869 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [Y]WO8000259 (OWEN O); | [A]EP0037742 (NYEGAARD & CO AS [NO]); | [A]EP0054689 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 77, no. 3, 17th July 1972, page 215, no. 15953b, Columbus, Ohio, US; K.S. ROGERS et al.: "Molecular interactions of uncompetitive inhibitors with bovine liver glutamate dehydrogenase", & J. BIOL. CHEM. 1972, 247(11), 3671-6 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 97, no. 9, 30th August 1982, page 271, no. 68442d, Columbus, Ohio, US; M.T. VINCENZINI et al.: "Specific interaction among some enzymes and sodium dodecyl sulfate", & LIFE SCI. 1982, 31(5), 463-70 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 1, 3rd January 1983, page 197, no. 2128v, Columbus, Ohio, US; M.T. VINCENZINI et al.: "Sodium dodecyl sulfate, a competitive inhibitor of some dehydrogenases", & C.R. SEANCES SOC. BIOL. SES FIL. 1982, 176(4), 474-8 | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 1, 03 January 1983, Columbus, OH (US); M.T.VINCENZINI et al.: "Sodium dodecyl sulfate, a competitive inhibitor of some dehydrogenases", p. 197, no. 2128v |