EP0157017 - Arrangement of supports for the magnetic heads of a magnetic disc drive unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ihlenburg, Rainer Pariser Strasse 47 D-1000 Berlin 15 / DE | 02 /
Baitz, Günter Krantorweg 13 D-1000 Berlin 27 / DE | 03 /
NIXDORF, Heinz Fuerstenallee 7 4790 Paderborn / DE | [2007/32] |
Former [1986/22] | 01 /
Ihlenburg, Rainer Pariser Strasse 47 D-1000 Berlin 15 / DE | ||
02 /
Baitz, Günter Krantorweg 13 D-1000 Berlin 27 / DE | |||
03 /
NIXDORF, Heinz Fuerstenallee 7 | |||
Former [1985/41] | 01 /
Ihlenburg, Rainer Pariser Strasse 47 D-1000 Berlin 15 / DE | ||
02 /
Baitz, Günter Krantorweg 13 D-1000 Berlin 27 / DE | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/08] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/41] | Schaumburg & Thoenes Mauerkircherstrasse 31 Postfach 86 07 48 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84116480.9 | 28.12.1984 | [1985/41] | Priority number, date | DE19843412231 | 02.04.1984 Original published format: DE 3412231 | [1985/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0157017 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11B21/16 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
G11B5/5521 (EP,US);
G11B5/4813 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/51] |
Former [1985/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Trägeranordnung für Magnetköpfe eines Magnetplattenlaufwerkes | [1985/41] | English: | Arrangement of supports for the magnetic heads of a magnetic disc drive unit | [1985/41] | French: | Arrangement de supports pour têtes magnétiques d'une unité de disque magnétique | [1985/41] | File destroyed: | 17.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 03.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, LU, SE | 17.09.1985 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/03] | 18.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/10] | 30.09.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.04.1985 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 02.04.1985 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 02.04.1985 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 02.04.1985 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3016630 [ ] (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]); | DE3217343 [ ] (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | DE3218934 [ ] (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | DE3218895 [ ] (PHILIPS NV [NL]) |