EP0116378 - Single-phase synchronous motor with angularly displaced magnetisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
AT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/34] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
AT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertram, Leo Am Sender 10 D-5190 Stolberg / DE | [1984/34] | Representative(s) | Kupfermann, Fritz-Joachim, et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Postfach 10 51 49 20035 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/34] | Kupfermann, Fritz-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Postfach 10 51 49 D-20035 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 84200033.3 | 11.01.1984 | [1984/34] | Priority number, date | DE19833301264 | 17.01.1983 Original published format: DE 3301264 | [1984/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0116378 | Date: | 22.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0116378 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H02K21/18, H02K1/14 | [1984/34] | CPC: |
H02K21/18 (EP,US);
H02K16/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1984/34] | Title | German: | Einphasensynchronmotor mit Läuferteilen mit winkelverstellter Magnetisierung | [1984/34] | English: | Single-phase synchronous motor with angularly displaced magnetisation | [1984/34] | French: | Moteur monophasé synchrone avec magnétisation déplacée angulairement | [1984/34] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/01] | 21.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2449021 [ ] (STAHL MAURICE D); | DE1913843 [ ] (HEBERLEIN & CO AG); | DE1757680 [ ] (JAEGER HERMANN) |