EP0119662 - Process for producing block-shaped building materials for walls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICOWA Verfahrenstechnik für Baustoffe GmbH & Co. KG Dormagener Strasse 46 50129 Bergheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | For all designated states SICOWA Verfahrenstechnik für Baustoffe GmbH & Co. KG Handerweg 17 D-52072 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ludwig, Udo, Prof. Dr.-Ing. Schmiedgasse 6 D-5100 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Fröhlich, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. Am Weissenberg 16-18 D-5100 Aachen / DE | [1984/39] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1984/39] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Marsch Dipl.-Ing. K. Sparing Dipl.-Phys.Dr. W.H. Röhl Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84200380.8 | 16.03.1984 | [1984/39] | Priority number, date | DE19833309402 | 16.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3309402 | [1984/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0119662 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0119662 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0119662 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/18 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
C04B28/18 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/18, C04B7/02, C04B7/323, C04B12/04, C04B38/00, C04B40/02 (EP);
C04B28/18, C04B7/02, C04B7/32, C04B11/05, C04B12/04, C04B22/14, C04B38/00, C04B40/02 (EP) |
Former IPC [1984/39] | C04B13/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von blockförmigen Wandbaustoffen | [1984/39] | English: | Process for producing block-shaped building materials for walls | [1984/39] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de matériaux de construction pour parois en forme de bloc | [1984/39] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/14] | 06.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | Licencee: | WAAGNER-BIRO Aktiengesellschaft Stadlauer Strasse 54 Postfach 11 A-1221 Wien / AT | Date: | 25.03.1986 |
Former [1986/20] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | WAAGNER-BIRO Aktiengesellschaft Stadlauer Strasse 54 Postfach 11 A-1221 Wien / AT | ||
Date: | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1249146 ; | [YD]EP0038552 (SICOWA VERFAHRENSTECH [DE]); | [E]DE3303042 (QUANTE HEINRICH); | [E]EP0151452 (SICOWA VERFAHRENSTECH [DE]) |