EP0123355 - Method of separating domestic waste [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1988 [1988/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESMIL B.V. De Boelelaan 7 P.O. Box 7811 NL-1008 AA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | For all designated states ESMIL B.V. De Boelelaan 7 P.O. Box 7811 NL-1008 AA Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goedhart, Cornelis Nijhofflaan 46 Uithoorn / NL | [1984/44] | Representative(s) | Wentzel, Hendrik Cornelis, et al Hoogovens Corporate Services BV, Industrial Property Department, P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | Wentzel, Hendrik Cornelis, et al Hoogovens Groep B.V. P.O. Box 10.000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 84200536.5 | 16.04.1984 | [1984/44] | Priority number, date | NL19830001400 | 21.04.1983 Original published format: NL 8301400 | [1984/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0123355 | Date: | 31.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0123355 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123355 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B03B9/06, B07B9/00, D21B1/02, B29B17/00 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
B03B9/06 (EP);
B03B9/061 (EP);
B07B9/00 (EP);
D21B1/028 (EP);
Y02W30/52 (EP);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/44] | B03B9/06, B07B9/00, D21B1/02, B29C29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Trennung von Hausmüll | [1984/44] | English: | Method of separating domestic waste | [1984/44] | French: | Procédé pour la séparation des déchets domestiques | [1984/44] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 06.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2263821 (TNO [NL]); | [A]FR2377238 (SVENSKA FLAEKTFABRIKEN AB [SE]); | [A]US4160722 (MARSH PAUL G); | [A]FR2430797 (TECNICOMPLEX SPA [IT]); | [A]GB2087757 (BABCOCK KRAUSS MAFFEI IND) | [AD] - DE INGENIEUR, vol. 86, no. 7, 14th February 1974, pages 131-133, Den Haag, NL; F.J.COLON: "Het TNO-scheidingssysteem voor huishoudelijk afval" |