EP0127920 - A process for preparing an alkylene compound starting from a fluorocyclopropane compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/50] | Fluorocyclopropanes | ||
[1988/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1989 [1989/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIONOGI & CO., LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/50] | For all designated states SHIONOGI & CO., LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoki, Tsutomu 3379-132, Shinge Sennan-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Hiromi 37-204, 5-chome 6, Hiyodoridai Kita-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Konoike, Toshiro 15-8, 3-chome, Uchihonmachi Suita-shi Osaka / JP | 04 /
Tsuji, Teruji 1-14-9, Yanagawa-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka / JP | 05 /
Nagata, Wataru 6-10, Kawahigashi-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo / JP | [1984/50] | Representative(s) | Hranitzky, Wilhelm Max, et al Novagraaf SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/50] | Hranitzky, Wilhelm Max, et al NOVAPAT - CABINET CHEREAU 9, rue du Valais CH-1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 84200753.6 | 24.05.1984 | [1984/50] | Priority number, date | JP19830097629 | 31.05.1983 Original published format: JP 9762983 | JP19830104519 | 10.06.1983 Original published format: JP 10451983 | [1984/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0127920 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0127920 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0127920 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/313, C07C43/192, C07C43/32, C07C41/30, C07C23/04, C07C17/28, C07C149/26, C07C149/16, C07C69/653, C07C69/63, C07C67/00 | [1984/50] | CPC: |
C07D505/00 (EP,US);
C07C323/00 (EP,US);
C07C323/30 (EP,US);
C07C43/192 (EP,US);
C07C43/313 (EP,US);
C07C43/32 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1984/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Alkylenverbindung ausgehend von einer Fluorcyclopropanverbindung | [1988/04] | English: | A process for preparing an alkylene compound starting from a fluorocyclopropane compound | [1988/04] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un composé alkylène à partir d'un composé fluorocyclopropane | [1988/04] |
Former [1984/50] | Fluorcyclopropane | ||
Former [1984/50] | Fluorocyclopropanes | ||
Former [1984/50] | Fluorocyclopropanes | Examination procedure | 28.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/24] | 30.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3825606 (O NEILL G, et al); | [A]DE2510869 (GRACE W R & CO) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93. no. 25, December 22, 1980, Columbus, Ohio, USA I. NAGAKURA et al. "Rearrangement of tertiary allylalcohols induced by bromination: effect of a fluorine substituent on the rate and the outcome of the reaction" page 782, abstract-no. 238 648n & Helv. Chim. Acta 1980, 63(5), 1257-63 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 71, no. 21, November 24, 1969, Columbus, Ohio, USA F. NERDEL et al. "Reduction of acetals with lithium aluminum hydride. General synthesis of open chain and cyclic 2-haloallyl esters" page 281, abstract-no. 101 232y & Chem Ber. 1969, 102 (9), 3102-10 |