EP0129922 - Adjustable headlight which can be at least partially dismantled for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1988 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 30.05.1990 [1990/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIMAVERNE INVESTMENT LIMITED Tunrawen Street, 1 London, W1Y1 FG / GB | [1985/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Capellari, Elio Via Moisesso, 27/2 I-33100 Udine / IT | 02 /
Monteferrario, Luciano Park Saint Roman 7 MC-Monte Carlo / MC | 03 /
Wullschleger, Carlo Salita C. Bossoli 1 CH-Lugano / CH | [1987/10] |
Former [1986/30] | 01 /
Capellari, Elio Via Moisesso, 27/2 I-33100 Udine / IT | ||
02 /
Monteferrario Lucian Park Saint Roman 7 MC-Monte Carlo / MC | |||
03 /
Nullschleger Carlo Salita C. Bossoli 1 | |||
Former [1985/01] | 01 /
Capellari, Elio Via Moisesso, 27/2 I-33100 Udine / IT | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 I-33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 84200795.7 | 02.06.1984 | [1985/01] | Priority number, date | IT19830083405 | 24.06.1983 Original published format: IT 8340583 | [1985/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0129922 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0129922 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/06 | [1985/01] | CPC: |
B60Q1/0683 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, SE [1985/01] | Title | German: | Einstellbarer, zum Teil zerlegbarer Scheinwerfer für Fahrzeuge | [1985/01] | English: | Adjustable headlight which can be at least partially dismantled for motor vehicles | [1985/01] | French: | Phare ajustable et partiellement démontable pour véhicule automobile | [1985/01] | Examination procedure | 25.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/36] | 04.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.03.1987 | SE | 04.03.1987 | [1990/22] |
Former [1989/12] | AT | 04.03.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]CH131019 (MUSY JEAN ALBERT [CH]); | [XD]FR2434994 (SEIMA); | [XD]DE3147938 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) |