EP0135204 - Measuring device for surface and subsurface defects in metal bodies above the Curie temperature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CISE- Centro Informazioni Studi Esperienze S.p.A. Via Carducci, 14 I-20123 Milano / IT | [1985/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caruso, Eugenio Via Catalani 58 I-20131 Milano / IT | 02 /
Gray, Antonio Via 1o Maggio 22 I-20090 Segrate Milan / IT | [1985/13] | Representative(s) | Martegani, Franco, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/13] | Martegani, Franco, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 84200818.7 | 08.06.1984 | [1985/13] | Priority number, date | IT19830021636 | 15.06.1983 Original published format: IT 2163683 | [1985/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0135204 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0135204 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/82 | [1985/13] | CPC: |
G01N27/82 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/13] | Title | German: | Messvorrichtung für Fehlstellen auf der Oberfläche oder nahe der Oberfläche von metallischen Gegenständen, deren Temperatur höher ist als die Curie-Temperatur | [1985/13] | English: | Measuring device for surface and subsurface defects in metal bodies above the Curie temperature | [1985/13] | French: | Appareil pour détecter des défauts à la surface et près de la surface de corps métalliques au-dessus de la température de Curie | [1985/13] | File destroyed: | 11.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/44] | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.04.1989 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5784349 ; | [A]JPS5853754 ; | [A]US2855565 (WALTER ENDERS); | [A]BE661856 ; | [A]US3586966 (HAISTY ROBERT W, et al); | [A]FR2134772 (SIDERURGIE FSE INST RECH); | [Y]US4024470 (VILD JOSEPH P, et al); | [X]US4286216 (AULD BERTRAM A, et al); | [YP]EP0088069 (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 166 (P-138)[1044]31st August 1982; & JP-A-57 084 349 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU K.K.) 26-05-1982 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 138 (P-204)[1283]16th June 1983; & JP-A-58 053 754 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 30-03-1983 |