EP0131977 - Process for eliminating mercury sludge layers from the bottom of mercury electrolysis cells, and process for elektrolysing an aqueous alcali metal halide solution in a mercury cathode cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY & Cie (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states SOLVAY & Cie (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schöberle, Robert Rue de la Concorde, 13 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | 02 /
Schaffer, Walter Esterhazystrasse, 13 A-5400 Hallein / AT | [1985/04] | Application number, filing date | 84200824.5 | 12.06.1984 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | FR19830010284 | 20.06.1983 Original published format: FR 8310284 | [1985/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0131977 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131977 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C25B15/00, C25B1/40 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
C25B15/00 (EP,US);
C25B1/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beseitigung von Quecksilberschlammschichten aus dem Boden der Quecksilberkathodenelektrolysezellen und Verfahren zur Elektrolyse einer wässrigen Alkalimetallhalogenidlösung in einer Quecksilberkathodenzelle | [1985/04] | English: | Process for eliminating mercury sludge layers from the bottom of mercury electrolysis cells, and process for elektrolysing an aqueous alcali metal halide solution in a mercury cathode cell | [1985/04] | French: | Procédé pour éliminer une couche de gros mercure de la sole des cellules d'électrolyse à cathode de mercure et procédé d'électrolyse d'une solution aqueuse d'halogénure de métal alcalin dans une cellule à cathode de mercure | [1985/04] | Examination procedure | 11.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/38] | 12.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 31.12.1987 | [1989/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU297391 ; | [Y]FR2229461 (ICI LTD [GB]); | [Y]FR2450288 (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]) |