EP0130638 - Unambiguous R.F. direction-finding system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.1990 [1990/50] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:BE
DE
FR
IT
NL
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:BE
DE
FR
IT
NL
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chua, Lye-Whatt RACAL-DECCA ADVANCED DEVELOPMENT Molesey Road Walton-on-Thames Surrey KT12 3PL / GB | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Moody, Colin James, et al PHILIPS ELECTRONICS Patents and Trade Marks Department Philips House 1-19 Torrington Place London WC1E 7HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | Moody, Colin James, et al PHILIPS ELECTRONICS Patents and Trade Marks Department Philips House 1-19 Torrington Place London WC1E 7HD / GB | ||
Former [1985/02] | Somerfield, Clive Julian PHILIPS ELECTRONICS Patents and Trade Marks Department Centre Point New Oxford Street London WC1A 1QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 84200868.2 | 15.06.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | GB19830016499 | 17.06.1983 Original published format: GB 8316499 | [1985/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0130638 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130638 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/36, G01S3/48 | [1985/02] | CPC: |
G01S3/36 (EP,US);
G01S3/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1985/02] | Title | German: | Gerät zur eindeutigen R-F-Richtungspeilung | [1985/02] | English: | Unambiguous R.F. direction-finding system | [1985/02] | French: | Dispositif de relèvement de direction à la radiofréquence, avec levée d'ambiguité | [1985/02] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/22] | 16.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1988 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3824595 (HALL S); | [Y]EP0023606 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]US3396395 (BALL REGINA A, et al); | [A]US4170774 (SCHAEFER CARL F [US]); | [A]US3761927 (AMOROSO S); | [A]US4366483 (HAGEDON GARY L, et al) |