EP0132883 - Linear motor for rapid to-and-fro movements of a mass-affected armature carriage unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flisikowski, Peter Joachim-Mähl-Strasse 1a D-2000 Hamburg 61 / DE | [1985/07] | Representative(s) | Kupfermann, Fritz-Joachim, et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Postfach 10 51 49 20035 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | Kupfermann, Fritz-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Postfach 10 51 49 D-20035 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 84201041.5 | 12.07.1984 | [1985/07] | Priority number, date | DE19833326238 | 21.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3326238 | [1985/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0132883 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0132883 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H02K41/035, H02K33/18 | [1986/21] | CPC: |
H02K33/18 (EP,US);
H02K41/0356 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/07] | H02K41/035 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/07] | Title | German: | Linearmotor zum raschen Hin- und Herbewegen eines massebehafteten Läuferschlittenbauteiles | [1985/07] | English: | Linear motor for rapid to-and-fro movements of a mass-affected armature carriage unit | [1985/07] | French: | Moteur linéaire pour effectuer un mouvement rapide de va-et-vient d'une pièce d'un induit glissant affectée d'une masse | [1985/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 16.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/50] | 06.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/14] | 07.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1990/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1989 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2846599 (BASF AG); | [A]US4331990 (FRANDSEN JORGEN) |