EP0136734 - Soil cultivating implement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | For all designated states C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Lely, Cornelis 7, Brüschenrain ZUG / CH | [1985/15] | Representative(s) | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 84201105.8 | 28.05.1982 | [1985/15] | Priority number, date | NL19810002623 | 29.05.1981 Original published format: NL 8102623 | [1985/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0136734 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0136734 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A01B49/02, A01B71/00 | [1985/15] | CPC: |
A01B33/065 (EP);
A01B49/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/15] | Title | German: | Bodenbearbeitungsgeräte | [1985/29] | English: | Soil cultivating implement | [1985/15] | French: | Machine pour travailler le sol | [1985/29] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 28.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/41] | 16.05.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP82200657.3 / EP0066344 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1989 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE874521 ; | [A]US3459268 ; | [A]US3572763 ; | [A]US1845178 ; | [A]DE356537 ; | [A]US2704047 ; | [A]US3101794 ; | [A]DE377856 ; | [A]US3045355 ; | [A]US2654339 |