EP0142177 - Transistor protection circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.1989 [1989/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bahlmann, Johannes Petrus Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1985/21] | Representative(s) | Peters, Rudolf Johannes, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | Peters, Rudolf Johannes, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 84201168.6 | 14.08.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | NL19830002902 | 18.08.1983 Original published format: NL 8302902 | [1985/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0142177 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0142177 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/52 | [1985/21] | CPC: |
H03F1/52 (EP,US);
Y10S323/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/21] | Title | German: | Transistorschutzschaltung | [1985/21] | English: | Transistor protection circuit | [1985/21] | French: | Circuit de protection pour transistor | [1985/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/06] | 21.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2184580 (GLE SEMICON UTTORI SOC [IT]); | [X]US4078207 (LEIDICH ARTHUR JOHN); | [A]GB1323640 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [A]DE2705583 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]FR2301948 (ITT [US]) |