EP0141436 - Process for the preparation of granules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1989 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 30.08.1989 [1989/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAMICARBON B.V. Mijnweg 1 NL-6167 AC Geleen / NL | [1986/47] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states UNIE VAN KUNSTMESTFABRIEKEN B.V. Maliebaan 81 NL-3581 CG Utrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mutsers, Stanislaus Martinus P. Eindstr. 9 NL-6166 EH Geleen / NL | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis R., et al DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Geleen Postbus 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland, et al OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [1985/20] | Roeffen, Wilhelmus Johannes Maria OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 84201207.2 | 21.08.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | NL19830002999 | 27.08.1983 Original published format: NL 8302999 | [1985/20] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141436 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141436 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141436 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01J2/16, C05C9/00, B05B7/10 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
B01J2/16 (EP,US);
H01R4/00 (KR);
Y10S159/03 (EP,US);
Y10S159/21 (EP,US);
Y10S159/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1985/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Granulaten | [1985/20] | English: | Process for the preparation of granules | [1985/20] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de granules | [1985/20] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/01] | 22.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.1988 | SE | 22.08.1988 | BE | 31.08.1988 | [1989/35] |
Former [1989/24] | AT | 13.04.1988 | |
SE | 22.08.1988 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 13.04.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2418669 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]US4171091 (HENDRIKS PETRUS F A M [NL], et al); | [A]FR2481948 (AZOTE SA CIE NEERLANDAISE [BE]) |