EP0136744 - Method for developing magnetic latent images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1988 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gaudioso, Stephen L. 1077 Everwild View Webster New York / US | [1985/15] | Representative(s) | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1985/15] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 84201209.8 | 28.01.1981 | [1985/15] | Priority number, date | US19800115974 | 28.01.1980 Original published format: US 115974 | US19800115973 | 28.01.1980 Original published format: US 115973 | [1985/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0136744 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0136744 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/14, G03G19/00 | [1985/15] | CPC: |
G03G9/0833 (EP);
G03G9/0832 (EP);
G03G9/08755 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Entwickeln von latenten magnetischen Bildern | [1985/25] | English: | Method for developing magnetic latent images | [1985/15] | French: | Méthode de dévelopement d'images latentes magnétiques | [1985/25] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/43] | 31.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP81300371.2 / EP0033248 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.03.1988 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1988 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2025503 ; | [Y]US3590000 ; | [Y]US4031021 ; | [A]US3627682 |