EP0137547 - Two-crystal X-ray spectrometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.1991 [1991/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hornstra, Jan c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1985/16] | Representative(s) | Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [1989/02] | Andrews, Arthur Stanley PHILIPS ELECTRONICS Patents and Trade Marks Department Centre Point New Oxford Street London WC1A 1QJ / GB | ||
Former [1985/16] | Collett, Albert Raymond PHILIPS ELCTRONICS Patents andd Trade Marks Department Centre Point New Oxford Street London WC1A 1QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 84201305.4 | 11.09.1984 | [1985/16] | Priority number, date | GB19830024588 | 14.09.1983 Original published format: GB 8324588 | [1985/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0137547 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0137547 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0137547 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/36, G01N23/20, G21K1/06 | [1985/16] | CPC: |
G01N23/2076 (EP,US);
G01N23/223 (EP,US);
G21K1/06 (EP,US);
G21K2201/062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/16] | Title | German: | Zweikristall-Röntgenspektrometer | [1985/16] | English: | Two-crystal X-ray spectrometer | [1985/16] | French: | Spectromètre de rayons X à deux cristaux | [1985/16] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/31] | 30.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 07.03.1990 | [1990/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3639759 (GOSHI YOICHI, et al) | [A] - APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY, vol. 35, no. 2, March-April 1982, pages 171-174, Baltimore, Maryland US; Y. GOHSHI et al.: "Wide range two-crystal vacuum X-ray spectrometer for chemical state analysis" | [A] - SOVIET PHYSICS - CRYSTALLOGRAPHY, vol. 19, no. 5, March/April 1975, pages 656-659, New York, US; E.K. KOV'EV et al.: "Two-crystal X-ray spectrometer for recording reflection and transmission curves for a wide range of diffraction angles" |