EP0180668 - Photographic elements comprising protective layers containing antistats [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.1989 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/20] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vandenabeele, Hubert Graaf d'Urselstraat 19 B-2510 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Vervecken, Jacques Louis de Roest d'Alkemadelaan 1, bus 10 B-2600 Berchem / BE | [1986/20] | Application number, filing date | 84201613.1 | 09.11.1984 | [1986/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0180668 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180668 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/82, // C07C125/06 | [1986/20] | CPC: |
G03C1/7614 (EP,US);
G03C1/895 (EP,US);
Y10S430/162 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/27] |
Former [1986/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Photographische Elemente, die Schutzschichten mit Antistatikmitteln enthalten | [1986/20] | English: | Photographic elements comprising protective layers containing antistats | [1986/20] | French: | Eléments photographiques comprenant des couches protectrices contenant des agents antistatiques | [1986/20] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1986 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, LU, NL | 03.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/48] | 20.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.11.1985 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 11.11.1985 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 11.11.1985 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 11.11.1985 | NL   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3552972 (MEYER KARL-OTTO, et al); | [Y]DE2805726 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [Y]DE2045464 ; | [AD]FR2095561 (AGFA GEVAERT NV); | [A]US4175969 (MACKEY E SCUDDER [US]) |