EP0147876 - Filled snack product having a hydrophilically coated filling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.03.1989 [1989/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, James Patrick 1487 Southridge Lane Cincinnati Ohio 45231 / US | [1985/28] | Representative(s) | Suslic, Lydia, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | Suslic, Lydia, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 84201615.6 | 09.11.1984 | [1985/28] | Priority number, date | US19830553290 | 17.11.1983 Original published format: US 553290 | [1985/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0147876 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0147876 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/164, A23L1/38, A23L1/48, A21D13/00, A21D13/08, A23G3/00 | [1985/28] | CPC: |
A23L7/122 (EP);
A21D13/26 (EP);
A23P20/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/28] | Title | German: | Gefülltes Snack-Produkt mit einer hydrophil überzogenen Füllung | [1985/28] | English: | Filled snack product having a hydrophilically coated filling | [1985/28] | French: | Produit de snack garni avec un remplisage couvert hydrophilique | [1985/28] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/10] | 25.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.1987 | [1989/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3265507 (JAPIKSE CORNELIS H); | [AD]US3532510 (ZIMMERMAN HOWARD K); | [A]US3959498 (LYALL ANGUS ALEXANDER, et al); | [A]DE2601474 (SWARTBERG LEVENSMIDDELEN FABRI); | [A]US4209536 (DOGLIOTTI AMILCARE [IT]); | [A]US4360534 (BRABBS WILLIAM J, et al); | [AP]EP0113174 (MORINAGA & CO [JP]) |