EP0145062 - Industrial process for the erection of masonry made of terracotta and cement and blocks for carrying out this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 09.10.1991 [1991/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rossi, Ede Romeo, Dr. Arch. Corso Trapani 98 I-10141 Torino / IT | [1985/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/25] | Representative(s) | Patrito, Pier Franco Cabinet PATRITO BREVETTI Via Don Minzoni 14 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | Patrito, Pier Franco, Dr. Ing. Cabinet PATRITO BREVETTI Via Don Minzoni 14 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 84201660.2 | 16.11.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | IT19830068268 | 07.12.1983 Original published format: IT 6826883 | [1985/25] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0145062 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0145062 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0145062 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/16, E04B2/20, E04C3/20 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
E04B2/52 (EP);
E04B1/161 (EP);
E04B2/24 (EP);
E04F11/035 (EP);
E04F11/116 (EP);
E04B2/8629 (EP);
E04B2002/025 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1985/25] | E04B1/16, E04C1/06, E04C1/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/25] | Title | German: | Industrialisiertes Verfahren zur Errichtung von Mauerwerk aus Terrakotta und Zement und Blöcke für die Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1985/25] | English: | Industrial process for the erection of masonry made of terracotta and cement and blocks for carrying out this process | [1985/25] | French: | Procédé industrialisé pour l'érection d'ouvrages de maçonnerie ayant une structure en terre cuite et ciment, et blocs pour la mise-en-oeuvre dudit procédé | [1985/25] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 26.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 02.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.07.1990 | GB | 18.07.1990 | NL | 18.07.1990 | SE | 18.07.1990 | [1991/41] |
Former [1991/33] | AT | 18.07.1990 | |
NL | 18.07.1990 | ||
SE | 18.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/29] | AT | 18.07.1990 | |
SE | 18.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/16] | SE | 18.07.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH296284 (HOENGER HANS [CH], et al); | [A]DE958772 (SPEZIAL BETONWAREN WERKE E G M); | [A]DE1509232 (BERTELE DR ING UBALDO); | [A]GB2062062 (MARTIN C M, et al); | [A]DE2946456 (DEGENKOLBE DIPL ING) |