EP0147879 - Process for the preparation of a hydroxylamine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sharma, Ashutosh Haridatt 72 Elmsfield Avenue Norden Rochdale Lancashire, OL11 5XN / GB | 02 /
Hope, Peter 16, Lakeside Hollingworth Lake Littleborough / GB | [1985/28] | Representative(s) | Sieders, René, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | Sieders, René, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 84201735.2 | 28.11.1984 | [1985/28] | Priority number, date | GB19830032555 | 06.12.1983 Original published format: GB 8332555 | NL19840000236 | 26.01.1984 Original published format: NL 8400236 | [1985/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0147879 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0147879 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07C83/00 | [1985/28] | CPC: |
C07C239/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hydroxylaminen | [1985/28] | English: | Process for the preparation of a hydroxylamine | [1985/28] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'hydroxylamines | [1985/28] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/10] | 18.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.12.1987 | BE | 16.12.1987 | SE | 31.12.1987 | [1989/21] |
Former [1989/13] | AT | 16.12.1987 | |
BE | 16.12.1987 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 16.12.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | JP7924837 [ ] | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol.91, No.7, August 13, 1979, page 669, column 1, abstractno. 56604w, COLUMBUS, OHIO, (US). & JP - A - 79 24 837 ( SHOWA DENKO K.K. ) ( 24-02-1979 ), & JP7924837 A 00000000 | [ ] - TETRAHEDRON, Vol.34, No.2, 1978, pages 213-215, Pergamon press, OXFORD, (GB). I.D. ENTWISTLE et al.: "Rapid catalytic transfer reduction of aromatic nitro compounds to hydroxylamines". * Table 2 * |