EP0121290 - Method and apparatus for thermal patterning of textile subtrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.1988 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.1988 [1988/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLIKEN RESEARCH CORPORATION Iron Ore Road P.O. Box 1927 Spartanburg South Carolina 29304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | For all designated states MILLIKEN RESEARCH CORPORATION Iron Ore Road P.O. Box 1927 Spartanburg South Carolina 29304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greenway, John Michael 1000 Wendover Way Spartanburg South Carolina 29302 / US | [1984/41] | Representative(s) | Bass, John Henton, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1984/41] | Application number, filing date | 84300109.0 | 09.01.1984 | [1984/41] | Priority number, date | US19830456491 | 07.01.1983 Original published format: US 456491 | [1984/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0121290 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121290 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D06C23/00 | [1984/41] | CPC: |
D06C23/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum thermischen Herstellen von Mustern auf textilen Warenbahnen | [1984/41] | English: | Method and apparatus for thermal patterning of textile subtrates | [1984/41] | French: | Procédé et installation pour la production thermique de motifs sur des substrats textiles | [1984/41] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/25] | 14.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3256581 ; | [AD]BE766310 (SCHROERS CO TEXTILAUSRUEST); | [AD]US3613186 (MAZZONE CHARLES P, et al); | [AD]US3774272 (RUBASCHEK N, et al); | [X]GB2065035 (MILLIKEN RES CORP); | [X]EP0057999 (MILLIKEN RES CORP [US]); | [X]EP0059029 (MILLIKEN RES CORP [US]) |