EP0115390 - Semiconductor lasers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.1990 [1990/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/32] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scifres, Donald R. 1337 Montclair Way Los Altos California 94022 / US | 02 /
Streifer, William 263 Fairfield Court Palo Alto California 94306 / US | 03 /
Burnham, Robert D. 2912 South Court Palo Alto California 94306 / US | [1984/32] | Representative(s) | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1984/32] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 84300201.5 | 13.01.1984 | [1984/32] | Priority number, date | US19830462840 | 01.02.1983 Original published format: US 462840 | [1984/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0115390 | Date: | 08.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0115390 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0115390 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/19 | [1984/32] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01S5/10 (US);
H01S5/04254 (EP,US);
H01S5/1064 (EP,US);
H01S5/16 (EP,US);
H01S2301/185 (EP,US);
H01S5/204 (EP);
H01S5/2234 (EP,US);
H01S5/3432 (EP,US);
H01S5/4031 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/32] | Title | German: | Halbleiterlaser | [1984/32] | English: | Semiconductor lasers | [1984/32] | French: | Laser à semi-conducteur | [1984/32] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1986 | New documents discovered [1986/29] | 19.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/35] | 25.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0010949 (XEROX CORP [US]) | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 40, no. 7, 1st April 1982, pages 571-573, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; H.K. CHOI: "Semiconductor internal-reflection- interference laser" | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 39, no. 2, 15th July 1981, pages 134-137, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; W.T. TSANG: "A graded-index waveguide separate-confinement laser with very low threshold and a narrow Gaussian beam" | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, vol.QE-17, no. 4, April 1981, pages 453-468, IEEE, New York, US; S. WANG et al.: "Control of mode behavior in semiconductor lasers" | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, vol.QE-15, no. 8, August 1979, pages 743-749, IEEE, New York, US; M. YAMADA et al.: "A condition of single longitudinal mode operation in injection lasers with index-guiding structure" | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 41, no. 11, 1st December 1982, pages 1030-1032, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; D.R. SCIFRES et al.: "Continuous wave high-power, high-temperature semiconductor laser phase-locked arrays" |