EP0118167 - Improvements in or relating to washing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THORN EMI Domestic Appliances Limited THORN EMI House Upper Saint Martin's Lane London, WC2H 9ED / GB | [1984/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christie, Stewart 12, Westbourne Court Chidham Park Havant Hampshire / GB | [1984/37] | Representative(s) | Marsh, Robin Geoffrey, et al THORN EMI Patents Limited Central Research Laboratories Dawley Road Hayes, Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/37] | Marsh, Robin Geoffrey, et al THORN EMI Patents Limited Central Research Laboratories Dawley Road Hayes, Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 84300231.2 | 16.01.1984 | [1984/37] | Priority number, date | GB19830005194 | 24.02.1983 Original published format: GB 8305194 | [1984/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0118167 | Date: | 12.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0118167 | Date: | 30.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D06F33/02, D06F39/04, D06F39/08, D06F37/42 | [1984/37] | CPC: |
D06F33/36 (EP,US);
D06F2103/16 (EP,US);
D06F2103/18 (EP,US);
D06F2105/04 (EP,US);
D06F2105/08 (EP,US);
D06F2105/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/37] | Title | German: | Waschmaschinen | [1984/37] | English: | Improvements in or relating to washing machines | [1984/37] | French: | Machines à laver | [1984/37] | File destroyed: | 14.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/14] | 29.10.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1238428 (MIELE & CIE MASCHF); | [X]DE1585734 (HOOVER LTD); | [X]US4031911 (FRAZAR JOSEPH H); | [A]DE2655797 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [X]DE2658435 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [X]GB1547992 (SERVIS DOMESTIC APPLIANCES LTD); | [A]DE3023355 (BAUER WILLI DIPL VOLKSW) |