EP0117054 - Method and apparatus for coating paper and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1988 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1984/35] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ranger, Alan Edgar 22 Arran Road Maidstone Kent ME15 7TE / GB | [1984/35] | Representative(s) | Farwell, William Robert, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | Farwell, William Robert, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 7 Staple Inn High Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | ||
Former [1984/35] | Rogers, John Edward UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 84300262.7 | 17.01.1984 | [1984/35] | Priority number, date | GB19830001189 | 17.01.1983 Original published format: GB 8301189 | GB19830001191 | 17.01.1983 Original published format: GB 8301191 | [1984/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0117054 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0117054 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D21H1/48, B05C9/00 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
D21H25/08 (EP,US);
B05C9/08 (EP,US);
B05C9/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Beschichtung von Papier und ähnlichem Material | [1984/35] | English: | Method and apparatus for coating paper and the like | [1984/35] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour le couchage du papier et matière analogue | [1984/35] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/26] | 11.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 10.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2325798 [ ] (PORTER LAURENCE W); | GB1197856 [ ] (ST ANNES BOARD MILL CO LTD); | GB940704 [ ] (BRITISH CELLOPHANE LTD); | US2186957 [ ] (COLLINGS WILLIAM R, et al); | US2934467 [ ] (BERGSTEIN FRANK D); | US2252204 [ ] (ARTHUR REILLY); | GB1556805 [ ] (TOYO ALUMINIUM KK); | GB1143660 [ ]; | US3330688 [ ] (HALSEY BRENTON S, et al); | US3110612 [ ] (GOTTWALD BRUCE C, et al) |