Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
08.02.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.03.1989 [1989/13] |
14.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1988 [1988/44] |
26.09.1987 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.11.1987 [1987/46] |
07.03.1986 | Change - representative | published on 23.04.1986 [1986/17] |
23.04.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.06.1985 [1985/26] |
30.06.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.08.1984 [1984/35] |