EP0118182 - Pattern processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/37] | Pattern processing system | ||
[1990/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1991 [1991/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PATTERN PROCESSING TECHNOLOGIES INC. 511 Eleventh Avenue South, M.S. 424 Minneapolis Minnesota 55415 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/37] | For all designated states PATTERN PROCESSING TECHNOLOGIES INC. 511 Eleventh Avenue South, M.S. 424 Minneapolis Minnesota 55415 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Werth, Larry J. 4490 Oak Chase Way Eagan Minnesota 55123 / US | [1984/37] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1984/37] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 84300442.5 | 25.01.1984 | [1984/37] | Priority number, date | US19830465008 | 08.02.1983 Original published format: US 465008 | [1984/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0118182 | Date: | 12.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0118182 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0118182 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/62 | [1984/37] | CPC: |
G08B13/194 (EP,US);
G06T7/00 (EP,US);
G06V10/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1984/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Musterbearbeitung | [1990/23] | English: | Pattern processing method | [1990/23] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement de modèles | [1990/23] |
Former [1984/37] | System für Musterbearbeitung | ||
Former [1984/37] | Pattern processing system | ||
Former [1984/37] | Système pour le traitement de modèles | Examination procedure | 12.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 21.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 06.06.1990 | SE | 06.06.1990 | [1991/18] |
Former [1991/12] | SE | 06.06.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3599149 (PARDOE CARROLL T); | [A]US4110737 (FAHEY WILLIAM DAVID); | [A]US4286330 (ISAACSON JOEL D) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS, vol. SMC-10, no. 1, January 1980, pages 25-32; IEEE; M.J. DOBREE WILSON: "Artificial perception in adaptive arrays" | Examination | EP0118978 |