EP0115434 - Semicrystalline ethylene alpha-olefin copolymers for hot melt adhesives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.09.1986 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/32] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metzler, Donald Kenneth 17267 Monitor Avenue Baton Rouge Louisiana / US | 02 /
Kresge, Edward Nathan 68 Parlin Lane Watchung New Jersey / US | [1984/32] | Representative(s) | Dew, Melvyn John, et al Exxon Chemical Limited European Patents and Licences Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.Po. Box 1 Abingdon, Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/32] | Dew, Melvyn John, et al Exxon Chemical Limited European Patents and Licences Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.Po. Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 84300496.1 | 26.01.1984 | [1984/32] | Priority number, date | US19830461381 | 27.01.1983 Original published format: US 461381 | [1984/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0115434 | Date: | 08.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0115434 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C09J3/14 | [1984/32] | CPC: |
C09J123/0815 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/45] |
Former [1984/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Halbkristallinische Äthylen-alpha-olefin-Mischpolymerisate für Heissschmelzklebstoffe | [1984/32] | English: | Semicrystalline ethylene alpha-olefin copolymers for hot melt adhesives | [1984/32] | French: | Copolymères éthylène-alpha-oléfine semi-cristallins pour adhésifs fusibles à chaud | [1984/32] | File destroyed: | 14.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/32] | 28.04.1984 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, LU | 24.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1986/43] | 29.03.1986 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1986/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.02.1984 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 27.02.1984 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 27.02.1984 | LU   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2429720 ; | [A]US4198256 ; | [AD]CA856337 |