Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0118238
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
30.05.1991 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] |
09.06.1990 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.07.1990 [1990/30] |
17.01.1990 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 07.03.1990 [1990/10] |
12.09.1988 |
First examination report |
|
21.10.1987 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.12.1987 [1987/50] |
10.04.1987 |
Publication of search report |
published on 27.05.1987 [1987/22] |
14.07.1984 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.09.1984 [1984/37] |