Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0377256 | Global Dossier | 19.10.1994 | B1 | EP0377256 | 11.07.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | EP84300852 | 10.02.1984 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE54880T | 15.08.1990 | T1 | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | EP84300852 | 10.02.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU556827B | Global Dossier | 20.11.1986 | B2 | AU2451284 | 05.07.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0118238 | Global Dossier | 25.07.1990 | B1 | EP0118238 | 27.05.1987 | A3 | EP0118238 | 12.09.1984 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8401031 | 09.10.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1238241 | 21.06.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3482788D1 | 30.08.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3486355T | 11.05.1995 | T2 | DE3486355D1 | 24.11.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE8406421U | 03.01.1985 | U1 | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE8427478U | 03.01.1985 | U1 | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE8427479U | 03.01.1985 | U1 | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8502916 | 01.02.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1158826 | 25.02.1987 | B | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0436076B | 15.06.1992 | B2 | JPS59188483 | 25.10.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX158250 | 17.01.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4669902 | 02.06.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4789256 | 06.12.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4806033 | 21.02.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | IT6725483 | 07.03.1983 | Type | Divisional application | EP0377256 |