EP0116474 - Earth-working machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1987 [1987/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Hikoma Seisakusho 2469-1, Horigomecho Ashikaga-shi Tochigi-prefecture 326 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/34] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Hikoma Seisakusho 2469-1, Horigomecho Ashikaga-shi Tochigi-prefecture 326 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishi, Mitsuhiro 1320 Mizuhonocho Askikaga-shi Tochigi-prefecture 326 / JP | 02 /
Nagasawa, Yokichi 1902 Honjo 2-chome Ashikaga-shi Tochigi-prefecture 326 / JP | [1984/34] | Representative(s) | Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas, et al BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas, et al BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | ||
Former [1984/34] | Batchellor, John Robert BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 84300864.0 | 10.02.1984 | [1984/34] | Priority number, date | JP19830022350 | 12.02.1983 Original published format: JP 2235083 | JP19830035440 | 04.03.1983 Original published format: JP 3544083 | JP19830035441 | 04.03.1983 Original published format: JP 3544183 | JP19830164736 | 07.09.1983 Original published format: JP 16473683 | JP19830217573 | 18.11.1983 Original published format: JP 21757383 | [1984/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0116474 | Date: | 22.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0116474 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/12, E02F9/20, E02F3/32 | [1984/34] | CPC: |
E02F9/2037 (EP,US);
E02F9/123 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/34] | Title | German: | Maschine für Erdarbeiten | [1984/34] | English: | Earth-working machine | [1984/34] | French: | Engin de terrassement | [1984/34] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/48] | 03.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1528222 [ ] (WOOTEN MILLER BYRON); | US3963135 [ ] (COEURDEROY YVES G); | GB2000326 [ ] (POCLAIN SA); | DE3045002 [ ] (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]); | GB2092102 [ ] (KISHI MITSUHIRO); | EP0102144 [ ] (HIKOMA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) |