EP0119723 - Three-cue flight director system for helicopters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell Inc. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis MN 55408 / US | ||
Former [1984/39] | For all designated states SPERRY CORPORATION 1290, Avenue of the Americas New York, N.Y. 10019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Griffith, Carl Dean 301 E. Desert Park Lane Phoenix Arizona 85020 / US | 02 /
Skutecki, Edmund Richard 12232 North 45th Drive Glendale Arizona 85304 / US | [1984/39] | Representative(s) | Singleton, Jeffrey, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | Singleton, Jeffrey, et al Eric Potter Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 84300870.7 | 13.02.1984 | [1984/39] | Priority number, date | US19830466815 | 16.02.1983 Original published format: US 466815 | [1984/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0119723 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0119723 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0119723 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/06 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
G05D1/0669 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/39] | Title | German: | Flugkommando-Anzeiger-System mit drei Zeigern für Hubschrauber | [1989/34] | English: | Three-cue flight director system for helicopters | [1984/39] | French: | Système directeur de vol à trois indicateurs pour hélicoptères | [1984/39] |
Former [1984/39] | Flugleitersystem mit drei Zeigern für Hubschrauber | Examination procedure | 28.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/03] | 30.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2845623 (IDDINGS GEORGE E); | [AD]US2961052 (SMITH HARRY D, et al); | [AD]US3577195 (CLIFT CHARLES E); | [A]US3620488 (MILLER JUSTIN G); | [AD]US3916688 (DENDY JOHN C, et al); | [A]US4004756 (GERSTINE MILTON I, et al); | [AD]US4109886 (TRIBKEN EVERETT R, et al); | [AD]US4351187 (FOULKS ALAN L, et al) |