EP0117117 - Improvements in or relating to the treatment of estrogen deficiency conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.1987 [1987/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liehr, Joachim Georg 115 Beverly Lane Bellaire Texas / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | For all designated states Liehr, Joachim Georg 115 Beverly Lane Bellaire Texas / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/35] | Representative(s) | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 84300937.4 | 14.02.1984 | [1984/35] | Priority number, date | US19830468519 | 22.02.1983 Original published format: US 468519 | [1984/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0117117 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/565 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
A61K31/565 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/35] | Title | German: | Behandlung von Zuständen von Östrogen-Insuffizienz | [1984/35] | English: | Improvements in or relating to the treatment of estrogen deficiency conditions | [1984/35] | French: | Traitement des états estrogéno-déficients | [1984/35] | File destroyed: | 26.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/35] | 14.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 31.03.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/40] | 04.05.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1519508 (ROUSSEL UCLAF) | [XD] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 33, no. 6, June 1968, pages 2469-2473, Washington, D.C., US | [XP] - CHEMCIAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 19, 9th May 1983, page 57, no. 155364u, Columbus, Ohio, US |