EP0122692 - Regenerable filtration apparatus useable in oil/water separation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1988 [1988/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARINE CONSTRUCTION & DESIGN CO. 2300 West Commodore Way Seattle Washington 98199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/43] | For all designated states MARINE CONSTRUCTION & DESIGN CO. 2300 West Commodore Way Seattle Washington 98199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Joseph W. 9845 N.E. 22nd Street Bellevue Wa 98004 / US | [1984/43] | Representative(s) | Everitt, Christopher James Wilders, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/43] | Everitt, Christopher James Wilders, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 84300969.7 | 15.02.1984 | [1984/43] | Priority number, date | US19830477640 | 21.03.1983 Original published format: US 477640 | [1984/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0122692 | Date: | 24.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0122692 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B01D17/02, C02F1/40, B01D29/38 | [1984/43] | CPC: |
B01D17/0202 (EP,US);
B01D17/045 (EP,US);
B01D29/01 (EP,US);
B01D35/157 (EP,US);
B01D37/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/43] | Title | German: | Regenerationsfähige Filtervorrichtung verwendbar bei der Trennung von Öl und Wasser | [1984/43] | English: | Regenerable filtration apparatus useable in oil/water separation | [1984/43] | French: | Appareil régénérable de filtration utilisable dans la séparation huile-eau | [1984/43] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/20] | 14.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3617551 (JOHNSTON WALKER F, et al); | [XD]US4022694 (FRUMAN DANIEL H); | [AD]US4356090 (TRAN NHAN V) |