EP0127257 - Fiber-optic rotation sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.1992 [1992/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANDREW A.G. Zürich / CH | [1986/32] |
Former [1984/49] | For all designated states ANDREW CORPORATION 10500 West 153rd Street Orland Park Illinois 60462 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dyott, Richard B. 15134 Quail Hollow Drive Orland Park Illinois / US | [1984/49] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301023.2 | 17.02.1984 | [1984/49] | Priority number, date | US19830469977 | 25.02.1983 Original published format: US 469977 | [1984/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0127257 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0127257 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0127257 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/26 | [1984/49] | CPC: |
G01C19/721 (EP);
C03B37/027 (EP);
C03B37/02709 (EP);
G02B6/2551 (EP);
G02B6/2835 (EP);
G02B6/2843 (EP);
G02B6/4216 (EP);
C03B2203/04 (EP);
C03B2203/30 (EP);
C03B2203/32 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/49] | Title | German: | Faseroptischer Rotationssensor | [1984/49] | English: | Fiber-optic rotation sensor | [1984/49] | French: | Capteur de rotation à fibres optiques | [1984/49] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 09.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8300552 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) |