EP0121324 - Electrical connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.1988 [1988/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayes, Alan 604 High Street Sandyford Stoke on Trent / GB | [1984/41] | Representative(s) | Carpenter, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | Carpenter, David, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301315.2 | 29.02.1984 | [1984/41] | Priority number, date | GB19830006125 | 05.03.1983 Original published format: GB 8306125 | [1984/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0121324 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121324 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/424, H01R13/436 | [1984/41] | CPC: |
H01R13/4364 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/25] |
Former [1984/41] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Elektrische Steckverbinder | [1984/41] | English: | Electrical connectors | [1984/41] | French: | Connecteurs électriques | [1984/41] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 07.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2907957 ; | [A]DE1790043 ; | [A]EP0007709 | Examination | DE7739743U | DE2812024 |