EP0121327 - Impact resistant polymer with improved flow characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1989 [1989/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | ||
Former [1984/41] | For all designated states UNIROYAL, INC. 1230 Avenue of the Americas Rockefeller Center New York, New York 10020 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersen, Paul G. 36 Oak Hill Drive Southbury New Haven Connecticut 06488 / US | [1984/41] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Michael Robert, et al URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | Harrison, Michael Robert, et al URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301328.5 | 01.03.1984 | [1984/41] | Priority number, date | US19830471964 | 03.03.1983 Original published format: US 471964 | [1984/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121327 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121327 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121327 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08F255/04, C08F2/02, // (C08F255/04, 212:08) | [1984/41] | CPC: |
C08F255/04 (EP,US);
C08F255/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F255/04, C08F212/08 (US,EP);
C08F255/06, C08F212/08 (US,EP);
C08F255/06, C08F212/08, C08F220/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/41] | Title | German: | Polymere mit hoher Schlagzähigkeit und verbessertem Flüssigkeitsgrad | [1984/41] | English: | Impact resistant polymer with improved flow characteristics | [1984/41] | French: | Polymère avec résistance au choc élevée et à fluidité améliorée | [1984/41] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 11.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0109272 (UNIROYAL INC [US]); | [AD]GB2005276 (UNIROYAL INC); | [A]US3489821 (WITT HARRY S, et al) |