EP0132017 - Crossbow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oakwood Sport and Survival Limited Nelson House Hamilton Terrace Leamington Spa Warwickshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | For all designated states Oakwood Sport and Survival Limited Nelson House Hamilton Terrace Leamington Spa Warwickshire / GB | ||
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states OAKLAND DESIGN PRODUCTS LIMITED Nelson House Hamilton Terrace Leamington Spa Warwickshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williams, Ivan Patrick The Flat Oakland Farm Lime Pit Lane Huntingdon Nr. Cannock / GB | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Hepworth, John Malcolm Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Hepworth, John Malcolm Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301434.1 | 05.03.1984 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | GB19830006072 | 04.03.1983 Original published format: GB 8306072 | [1985/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0132017 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0132017 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132017 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F41B5/12 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
F41B5/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/04] | F41B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/04] | Title | German: | Armbrust | [1985/04] | English: | Crossbow | [1985/04] | French: | Arbalète | [1985/04] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 07.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 11.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.1986 | 31.03.1988 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.08.1991 | BE | 07.08.1991 | CH | 07.08.1991 | IT | 07.08.1991 | LI | 07.08.1991 | NL | 07.08.1991 | SE | 07.08.1991 | FR | 27.12.1991 | LU | 31.03.1992 | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 07.08.1991 | |
BE | 07.08.1991 | ||
CH | 07.08.1991 | ||
IT | 07.08.1991 | ||
LI | 07.08.1991 | ||
NL | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
FR | 27.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/32] | AT | 07.08.1991 | |
BE | 07.08.1991 | ||
CH | 07.08.1991 | ||
LI | 07.08.1991 | ||
NL | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
FR | 27.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/25] | AT | 07.08.1991 | |
CH | 07.08.1991 | ||
LI | 07.08.1991 | ||
NL | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
FR | 27.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/15] | AT | 07.08.1991 | |
CH | 07.08.1991 | ||
LI | 07.08.1991 | ||
NL | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/13] | CH | 07.08.1991 | |
LI | 07.08.1991 | ||
NL | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/12] | CH | 07.08.1991 | |
LI | 07.08.1991 | ||
NL | 07.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/09] | CH | 07.08.1991 | |
LI | 07.08.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2918050 (KOPMAN FRANCIS R); | [A]US3561419 (CUCUZZA JOSEPH R SR); | [A]US3670711 (FIRESTONE MAX); | [A]US3968783 (PFOTENHAUER JAMES M); | [A]US4169456 (VAN HOUSE ROBERT M [US]); | [A]US4258689 (BARNETT BERNARD T) | Examination | - Encyclopedie van Wapens, (Uitgeverij Helmond B.V.) - Helmond 1981, Page 105 |