EP0132904 - Container closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomas Hunter Limited Omnia Works Rugby Warwickshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | For all designated states Thomas Hunter Limited Omnia Works Rugby Warwickshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edwards, Cyril Kenneth Omnia Works Rugby Warwickshire CV21 1BA / GB | 02 /
Croft, Brian Hugh Omnia Works Rugby Warwickshire CV21 1BA / GB | [1985/07] | Representative(s) | Adkins, Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | Adkins, Michael, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301440.8 | 05.03.1984 | [1985/07] | Priority number, date | GB19830016772 | 21.06.1983 Original published format: GB 8316772 | [1985/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0132904 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0132904 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/08 | [1985/07] | CPC: |
B65D41/08 (EP);
B65D47/063 (EP);
B65D51/20 (EP);
B65D2251/0015 (EP);
B65D2251/0087 (EP);
B65D2251/0096 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/07] | Title | German: | Behälterverschluss | [1985/07] | English: | Container closure | [1985/07] | French: | Fermeture pour récipients | [1985/07] | File destroyed: | 26.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 19.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/49] | 02.10.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/15] | 11.11.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1986 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AT298276B [ ]; | FR1008677 [ ]; | GB189611667 [ ]; | GB429233 [ ]; | DE2626183 [ ]; | AT155246B [ ]; | US1030293 [ ] (ERICKSON FREDERIC WM [US]); | US591849 [ ]; | US2661128 [ ]; | US3250428 [ ] |