Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.1988 [1988/19] |
04.04.1987 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.05.1987 [1987/21] |
25.04.1986 | First examination report | |
05.06.1985 | Publication of search report | published on 07.08.1985 [1985/32] |
24.10.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.12.1984 [1984/52] |
27.07.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.09.1984 [1984/39] |