EP0119786 - Improvements in burners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.1988 [1988/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Gas Corporation Rivermill House, 152 Grosvenor Road London SW1V 3JL / GB | For all designated states Hotwork Development Limited Little Royd Mills Low Road Earlsheaton Dewsbury West Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | For all designated states British Gas Corporation Rivermill House 152 Grosvenor Road London SW1V 3JL / GB | ||
For all designated states Hotwork Development Limited Little Royd Mills Low Road Earlsheaton Dewsbury West Yorkshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ward, Trevor Cliff Cottage Earlsheaton Dewsbury / GB | 02 /
Wray, George 9 Derwent Road Dewsbury West Yorkshire / GB | 03 /
Goodfellow, James Herbert 552 Leeds Road Dewsbury West Yorkshire / GB | [1984/39] | Representative(s) | Morgan, David James British Gas plc Intellectual Property Department 59 Bryanston Street London W1A 2AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | Morgan, David James British Gas plc, Intellectual Property Department, 59 Bryanston Street London W1A 2AZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301478.8 | 06.03.1984 | [1984/39] | Priority number, date | GB19830006795 | 11.03.1983 Original published format: GB 8306795 | [1984/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0119786 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0119786 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0119786 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F23L15/00, F23C3/00 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
F23D14/22 (EP,US);
F23C3/00 (EP,US);
F23C7/02 (EP,US);
F23M5/025 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/39] | Title | German: | Brenner | [1984/39] | English: | Improvements in burners | [1984/39] | French: | Brûleurs | [1984/39] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1984 | Examination requested [1984/52] | 29.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2053805 (GAS COUNCIL); | [A]FR2272338 (MIDLAND ROSS CORP [US]); | [AD]GB2128724 (BRITISH GAS CORP) |