EP0122030 - A magnetic recording member and a manufacturing method for such a member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1988 [1988/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON SHINKU GIJUTSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA also trading as ULVAC CORPORATION 2500, Hagizono Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states NIHON SHINKU GIJUTSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA also trading as ULVAC CORPORATION 2500, Hagizono Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Kyuzo 672-20, Yachimata Ho Yachimata-machi Inba-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Ota, Yoshifumi 129, Yachimata Ni Yachimata-machi Inba-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Taiki c/o Umenosato-ryo NIHON SHINKU GIJUTSU K.K. 617-2, Aza Umenosato Asahi Yachimata-machi Inba-gun Chiba-ken / JP | [1984/42] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301530.6 | 08.03.1984 | [1984/42] | Priority number, date | JP19830036652 | 08.03.1983 Original published format: JP 3665283 | JP19830036653 | 08.03.1983 Original published format: JP 3665383 | JP19830072075 | 26.04.1983 Original published format: JP 7207583 | JP19830085786 | 18.05.1983 Original published format: JP 8578683 | JP19830088389 | 21.05.1983 Original published format: JP 8838983 | [1984/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0122030 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0122030 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/64, G11B5/84, H01F41/20 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
H01F41/20 (EP,US);
G11B5/658 (EP,US);
G11B5/85 (EP,US);
H01F10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/42] | Title | German: | Magnetisches Aufzeichnungsmedium und Herstellungsverfahren für ein derartiges Medium | [1984/42] | English: | A magnetic recording member and a manufacturing method for such a member | [1984/42] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement magnétique et procédé pour la fabrication d'un tel milieu | [1984/42] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1984/42: Ein Antrag nach Regel 88 EPÜ auf Berichtigung der Beschreibung / Patentansprüche / wurde am 29.03.84 eingereicht. | EPB 1984/42: A request pursuant to Rule 88 EPC for correcting the description / claims / has been filed on 29.03.84 | EPB 1984/42: Une requête selon la Règle 88 CBE pour correction de la description / la(les) revendification(s) / a été reçue en date du 29.03.84 | Examination procedure | 06.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/03] | 16.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2376485 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]US4239835 (FUJITA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]DE3021155 (WOLFF HANS); | [Y]DE3226639 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | EP0023328 | EP0054269 |